EP1167016 - Oxygen absorbable laminate and production method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Kaisha, Ltd. 18-1, Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8640 / JP | [2012/36] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA, LTD. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishizaki, Youichi 25, Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0822 / JP | 02 /
Nishizuka, Hidehiko 25, Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0822 / JP | 03 /
Ichikawa, Kentaro 25-403, Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241-0822 / JP | [2002/11] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
Ishizaki, Youichi 25, Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0822 / JP | ||
02 /
Nishizuka, Hidehiko 25, Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0822 / JP | |||
03 /
Ichikawa, Kentaro 25, Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0822 / JP | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Clerc, Natalia, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810582.5 | 15.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000182561 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000182561 | JP20000219150 | 19.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000219150 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1167016 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1167016 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B38/00, B32B27/20, B32B38/06 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B32B38/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (KR);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (KR);
B32B38/0012 (KR);
B32B7/02 (KR);
B32B2038/0016 (EP,US);
B32B2038/002 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0056 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0076 (EP,US);
B32B2307/538 (KR);
B32B2307/74 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2439/46 (EP,US);
B32B2553/00 (EP,US);
B32B38/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1338 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1341 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1383 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24992 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/258 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/37] | B32B27/20, B32B31/00, B32B33/00, B32B27/08, B32B27/32, B32B27/18, B65D81/26 | ||
Former IPC [2002/01] | B32B27/20, B32B31/00, B32B33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/24] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sauerstoff absorbierendes Laminat und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2002/01] | English: | Oxygen absorbable laminate and production method thereof | [2002/01] | French: | Stratifié absorbant l'oxygène et procédé de sa production | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0781649 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1,10 * page 10, lines 37,38; figure 1; example 1; claims 1-3 * [A] 4,5,13; | [YDA]JPH0951786 ; | [A]WO9852768 (HORSELL GRAPHIC IND LTD [GB], et al) [A] 2,4 * claims 1,2,10,16 *; | [A]JPS6469332 ; | [A]JPH05310274 | [YDA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 18, Database accession no. 1997-196260, XP002247169 & JPH0951786 A 19970225 (AJINOMOTO KK) [YD] 1,10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0031] - [0035]; figures 3,4; claims 1,3 * [A] 3 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 17, Database accession no. 1989-125206, XP002247170 & JPS6469332 A 19890315 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 03, Database accession no. 1994-018482, XP002247171 & JPH05310274 A 19931122 (TOA GOSEI CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012]; claim 1 * |