EP1186811 - Sealing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coperion Buss AG Hohenrainstrasse 10 4133 Pratteln 1 / CH | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franz, Peter Sonnenbergstr. 28 5127 Birsfelden / CH | 02 /
Roese, Bernd u. Baselblick 8 79594 Inzlingen / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810810.0 | 21.08.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | CH20000001770 | 12.09.2000 Original published format: CH 17702000 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1186811 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186811 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/18 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
F16J15/50 (EP,US);
F16C33/72 (KR);
B29B7/423 (EP,US);
F16J15/187 (EP,US);
F16J15/3224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/11] | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung | [2002/11] | English: | Sealing arrangement | [2002/11] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 20.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.09.2003 | TR | 17.09.2003 | [2009/42] |
Former [2007/09] | CY | 17.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB684373 (W J FRASER & CO LTD) [DA] 1,8-12 * page 1, line 87 - page 2, line 32 ** figures 2-4 *; | [DA]FR2450393 (CEFILAC) [DA] 1,2,6,8,9,11,12 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 33 * * figures 2,4 *; | [DA]WO9421944 (CHERNY HOLDINGS LTD [AU], et al) [DA] 1,3,4,8,9,11,12 * page 4, line 20 - page 9, line 5 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | GB684373 | DE1214199 | FR2450393 | WO9421944 |