EP1296205 - Chronograph mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Girard-Perregaux S.A. 1, place Girardet 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Girard-Perregaux S.A. 1, place Girardet 2301 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girardin, Johnny Fritz-Courvoisier 34F 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Gresset, Jean GLN S.A. Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel Puits-Godet 8a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Gresset, Jean GLN Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel Puits-Godet 8A 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810930.6 | 24.09.2001 | [2003/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296205 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G04F7/08 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
G04B43/002 (EP,US);
G04F7/0828 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/51] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Chronographmechanismus | [2003/13] | English: | Chronograph mechanism | [2003/13] | French: | Mécanisme de chronographe | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH228246 (LONGINES MONTRES COMP D [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2266791 (DANIELS GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 8 - line 19 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE19852347 (LANGE UHREN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1024416 (PATEK PHILIPPE SA [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 4,6,7 * |