EP1296441 - Power generating arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2006/33] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofstetter, Bruno Sommerhaldenstrasse 59 5200 Brugg / CH | 02 /
Golle, Ingo Sandstrasse 4b 5412 Gebenstorf / CH | 03 /
Ronner, Beat Hertenstein 17 5415 Nussbaumen / CH | 04 /
Mullis, Martin Künzlistrasse 17 8057 Zürich / CH | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2003/13] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810934.8 | 25.09.2001 | [2003/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296441 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296441 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/12, H02M7/5387, H02J3/01 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
H02M5/4585 (EP,US);
H02J3/01 (EP,US);
H02J7/345 (EP,US);
H02M1/126 (EP,US);
H02P9/105 (EP,US);
Y02E40/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2003/51] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Energieerzeugungseinrichtung | [2003/13] | English: | Power generating arrangement | [2003/13] | French: | Système de production d'énergie | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.08.2006 | NL | 16.08.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | NL | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | NL | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | IT | 16.08.2006 | |
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 16.08.2006 | |
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 16.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5903116 (GEIS EVERETT R [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0809879 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [DY]EP0682401 (SCHAFFNER ELEKTRONIK AG [CH]) [DY] 4 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1069673 (SCHAFFNER EMV AG [CH]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]US6154378 (PETERSON WILLIAM ANDERS [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * column 3, line 13 - column 3, line 54; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5811939 (HERNIAK EDWARD [CA]) [Y] 7-9 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 32; figure 3 *; | [Y]SE410952 (ASEA AB [SE]) [Y] 10 * figures 1,2 * | [Y] - MALESANI L ET AL, "AC/DC/AC PWM CONVERTER WITH REDUCED ENERGY STORAGE IN THE DC LINK", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19950301), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 0093-9994, pages 287 - 292, XP000513103 [Y] 2 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.370275 | [A] - LINDGREN M ET AL, "Control of a voltage-source converter connected to the grid through an LCL-filter-application to active filtering", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 1998. PESC 98 RECORD. 29TH ANNUAL IEEE FUKUOKA, JAPAN 17-22 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980517), ISBN 0-7803-4489-8, pages 229 - 235, XP010294951 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1998.701904 | [A] - LINDGREN M B, "Feedforward-time efficient control of a voltage source converter connected to the grid by lowpass filters", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 1995. PESC '95 RECORD., 26TH ANNUAL IEEE ATLANTA, GA, USA 18-22 JUNE 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19950618), ISBN 0-7803-2730-6, pages 1028 - 1032, XP010150677 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1995.474942 |