EP1136009 - An anti-ice and anti-snow bottom for application under the shoe sole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bartolini, Emilio Via Lucania 4 62012 Civitanova Marche (MC) / IT | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [2001/39] | Application number, filing date | 01830202.6 | 23.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | IT2000MC00027 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: IT MC000027 | [2001/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136009 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A43C15/06, A43B3/16 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
A43C15/06 (EP,US);
A43B3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] |
Former [2002/24] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Eis- und Schneeschutzvorrichtung zur Benutzung unter der Sohle des Schuhes | [2001/39] | English: | An anti-ice and anti-snow bottom for application under the shoe sole | [2001/39] | French: | Semelle anti-glace et anti-neige à fixer sous la semelle d'une chaussure | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3009269 (FOLK JAMES S) [A] 1,4* the whole document *; | [Y]US3913243 (ARNOLD KENNETH E, et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2423173 (MICHEL MARTIAL [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XA]FR2709929 (INOVA FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2 * claim - * [A] 3; | [X]US5836090 (SMITH DOUGLAS N [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * |