EP1281410 - Automatic safety syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Restelli, Sergio Via Quarto Peperino, 333 B 00100 Rome / IT | For all designated states Righi, Nardino Via cavour 7 20047 Brugherio (Milano) / IT | For all designated states Rossi, Roberto Via delle Ande 10 20151 Milano / IT | [2003/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Petruzziello, Aldo, et al Racheli S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Petruzziello, Aldo, et al Racheli & C. S p A Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830525.0 | 03.08.2001 | [2003/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281410 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
A61M5/3234 (EP,US);
A61M2005/31508 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/43] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Spritze mit automatisches Sicherung | [2003/06] | English: | Automatic safety syringe | [2003/06] | French: | Seringue avec dispositif de sécurité automatique | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5273541 (MALENCHEK ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * column 3, line 30 - line 50; figures 1-6 * [Y] 9-11; | [A]EP0911046 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 5 * column 2, line 17 - line 40; figure 19 *; | [A]US5876382 (ERICKSON CHARLES W [US]) [A] 9-11 * figures 2-6 *; | [Y]US5328484 (SOMERS BRICE [CH], et al) [Y] 9-11 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 15; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO0027450 (MDC INVEST HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 6, line 29 - page 9, line 25; figures 4A-6C *; | [A]US4185628 (KOPFER RUDOLPH J [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 25-30; figure 10 * |