EP1296374 - Process for bonding and electrically connecting microsystems integrated in several distinct substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20864 Agrate Brianza / IT | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2012/19] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware Corporation) 3000 Hanover Street Palo ALto CA 94304 / US | |||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware Corporation) 3000 Hanover Street Palo ALto CA 94304 / US | |||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Hewlett Packard Company, a Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mastromatteo, Ubaldo Via Santo Stefano 27 20010 Bareggio / IT | 02 /
Bombonati, Mauro Via Ticino 85 20081 Abbiategrasso / IT | 03 /
Morin, Daniela Via Nino Bixio 26 20010 Inveruno / IT | 04 /
Mottura, Marta Via Verdi 9 20077 Melegnano / IT | 05 /
Marchi, Mauro Via G. Leopardi 50 53040 Bettolle / IT | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2012/36] |
Former [2003/13] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830590.4 | 14.09.2001 | [2003/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296374 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296374 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48, B81B7/00, H01L21/18 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
B81C1/00269 (EP,US);
H01L21/185 (EP,US);
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L24/13 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/17 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L24/94 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0231 (EP,US);
H01L2224/02313 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05124 (EP);
H01L2224/05181 (EP);
H01L2224/05624 (EP);
H01L2224/10126 (EP,US);
H01L2224/10135 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13021 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1308 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13082 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13164 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81136 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81139 (EP,US);
H01L2224/812 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81201 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01022 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01024 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01046 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01073 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05124, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05181, H01L2924/01013, H01L2924/013 (EP);
H01L2224/05624, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/1308, H01L2224/13164 (US,EP);
H01L2224/13124, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/13164, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/51] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, um in mehreren unterschiedlichen Substraten integrierte Mikrosysteme zu bonden und elektrisch zu verbinden | [2003/13] | English: | Process for bonding and electrically connecting microsystems integrated in several distinct substrates | [2003/13] | French: | Procédé pour assembler et connecter électriquement des microsystèmes integrés dans plusieurs substrats differents | [2012/11] |
Former [2003/13] | Procédé pour assembler und connecter électriquement microsystèmes integrés in plusieurs substrats differents | Examination procedure | 25.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.09.2012 | FR | 05.11.2012 | [2013/40] |
Former [2013/37] | IT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2001021570 (LIN LIWEI [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * figure 2A * * paragraphs [0038] - [0043] - [0048] - [0051] - [0060] * [A] 2-7,9-16; | [A]DE10050364 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * figure 9 * * column 10, line 36 - column 12, line 20 *; | [A]EP0773436 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 5,7 * * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 30 *; | [A]JPH10107204 ; | [A]DE3233195 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 3,5,9,12 * figure 5 * * page 11, line 1 - line 11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10107204 A 19980424 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 6,13-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US2001021570 |