EP1201358 - A sanding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makor S.r.l. Via Casalpiano, 9/A 53048 Pieve di Sinalunga (Siena) / IT | [2002/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scaperrotta, Luigi Via G. Rossa, 7 53048 Sinalunga (Siena) / IT | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830648.0 | 16.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | IT2000BO00623 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: IT BO000623 | [2002/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1201358 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1201358 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24B7/28, B24B49/18, B24B7/06 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B24B7/28 (EP);
B24B49/183 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | B24B7/28, B24B49/18 | Designated contracting states | [2004/39] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schmirgelmaschine | [2002/18] | English: | A sanding machine | [2002/18] | French: | Machine de ponçage | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/52] | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57205068 ; | [Y]US3818650 (BEHNE S) [Y] 1-7 * column 8, line 32 - column 9, line 13 *; | [A]US4274231 (VEREGA JAMES) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 35; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4760668 (SCHLAEFLI ALFRED [CH]) [Y] 1-7 * column 5, line 15 - line 30; figure 1 * * column 9, line 32 - line 52 *; | [A]WO9219420 (GEBHARDT FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1,7 * figure 2; claims 6,7 *; | [A]US5901400 (FULOP ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * column 13, line 40 - column 14, line 47 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830311), vol. 007, no. 059, Database accession no. (M - 199), & JP57205068 A 19821216 (SHIBATA DENKI KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |