EP1310354 - A cardboard box-forming machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMG Impianti S.r.l. No. 5, via Regia 35018 San Martino di Lupari (Padova) / IT | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolzan, Mario no. 7, via Levico 35015 Galliera Veneta (Padova) / IT | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via Emilia Est 25 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830697.7 | 13.11.2001 | [2003/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1310354 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B31B5/80 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
B31B50/00 (EP);
B31B50/004 (EP,US);
B31B2100/00 (EP);
B31B2120/30 (EP);
B31B50/062 (EP);
B31B50/80 (EP);
B31B50/804 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/06] |
Former [2003/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Maschine zum Formen von Kartons | [2003/20] | English: | A cardboard box-forming machine | [2003/20] | French: | Machine pour former des cartons | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 11.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.12.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2058706 (SM SPA) [X] 1,2,9 * page 4, line 35 - line 43; figure 1 * * page 4, line 101 - line 114; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0705684 (AZIONARIA COSTRUZIONI ACMA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5049119 (BERSHADSKY BORIS [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * figure 5 *; | [A]US4411642 (GEE MINOR E [US]) [A] 9,10 * figures 31,48F * |