EP1250976 - Machine tool for machining elongated pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paolino Bacci S.r.l. Viale Campania 32 56021 Cascina, PI / IT | [2018/29] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Paolino Bacci S.R.L. Viale Campania 32 56021 Cascina, PI / IT | ||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Bacci Paolino Di Bacci Di Agostino Via Tosco-Romagnola 270 56021 Cascina, Pisa / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruggieri, Alberto Via della Bianca 11 56025 Pontedera, Pisa / IT | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [2018/29] |
Former [2002/43] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.R.L, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830761.1 | 13.12.2001 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | IT2000FI00068 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: IT FI000068 | [2002/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1250976 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1250976 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/00, B27F1/00 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
B27M1/08 (EP);
B23Q1/5406 (EP);
B23Q1/626 (EP);
B23Q39/04 (EP);
B27C5/00 (EP);
B27C9/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2018/29] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschinen zum bearbeiten von länglichen Werkstücken | [2002/43] | English: | Machine tool for machining elongated pieces | [2002/43] | French: | Machine-outil pour l'usinage de pièces allongées | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | DK | 18.07.2018 | ES | 18.07.2018 | FI | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | NL | 18.07.2018 | PT | 18.07.2018 | SE | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | GB | 13.12.2018 | IE | 13.12.2018 | LU | 13.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PT | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3685915 (VIERSTRAETE JEAN) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4649971 (HANNAFORD JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4114895 (KLESSMANN IMA NORTE MASCHFAB [DE]) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4114828 (GEBHARDT FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1-12* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0608746 (BALJER & ZEMBROD [DE]) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0634247 (HAGEN URS [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 * |