EP1276318 - Method and apparatus for transmitting, receiving and displaying information in an interactive television system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tv-Lab S.p.a. Viale delle Querce, 7 31033 Castelfranco Veneto (Prov. of Treviso) / IT | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vazzoler, Alberto Parc Saint Roman 7 98000 Montecarlo / MC | 02 /
Straus, Stefano Via Forche, 2/A 31033 Castelfranco, (Prov. of Treviso) / IT | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/03] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830778.5 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | EP20010830467 | 13.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01830467 | [2003/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1276318 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/173 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
H04N21/454 (EP);
H04N21/23614 (EP);
H04N21/4122 (EP);
H04N21/41265 (EP);
H04N21/42204 (EP);
H04N21/42209 (EP);
H04N21/42676 (EP);
H04N21/4348 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/4622 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N21/4782 (EP);
H04N21/6581 (EP);
H04N7/17318 (EP);
H04N21/23109 (EP);
H04N21/42224 (EP);
H04N21/4316 (EP);
H04N21/4722 (EP);
H04N21/4888 (EP);
H04N21/812 (EP);
H04N21/8133 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für Übertragung, Empfang und Informationsanzeige in einem interaktiven Fernsehsystem | [2003/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for transmitting, receiving and displaying information in an interactive television system | [2003/03] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la transmission, réception et affichage d'informations dans un système de télévision interactive | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2004 | 31.12.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6097441 (ALLPORT DAVID E [US]) [Y] 1,14 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 36 * [A] 2-13,15-21; | [YA]GB2343073 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-13,15-21; | [A]US2001000826 (BELLAMY JOHN C [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9960782 (EVOLVE PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * page 4, line 17 - page 9, line 19 *; | [A]WO0115437 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11298822 ; | [A]EP1111915 (TWO WAY TV LTD [GB]) [A] 1,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11298822 A 19991029 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * abstract * |