EP1321557 - Improved drum for clothes washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Candy S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [2013/33] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states CANDY S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fumagalli, Silvano Via Grigna, 2 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2013/33] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/26] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830784.3 | 20.12.2001 | [2003/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1321557 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1321557 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/06, D06F21/04, D06F23/02, D06F23/06 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
D06F37/065 (EP);
D06F23/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/26] | D06F21/04, D06F23/02, D06F23/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/12] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbesserte Trommel für eine Waschmaschine | [2003/26] | English: | Improved drum for clothes washing machine | [2003/26] | French: | Tambour amelioré pour une machine à laver | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 30.12.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3201958 (GEOFFREY SMITH) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2268939 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4310006 (INST ANGEWANDTE FORSCHUNG GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1297787 (HOOVER LTD) [A] 1,12 * the whole document * |