EP1186813 - Contactless axial carbon seal for a bearing housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techspace Aero S.A. Route de Liers, 121 4041 Herstal / BE | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tran, Quac Hung Bd. Emile de Laveleye, 54 4020 Liege / BE | 02 /
Rouelle, Sébastien rue de l'Arène, 19 4560 Bois-et-Borsu / BE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al Pronovem - Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Boulevard de la Sauvenière, 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 01870193.8 | 05.09.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | EP20000870192 | 07.09.2000 Original published format: EP 00870192 | EP20000870206 | 15.09.2000 Original published format: EP 00870206 | [2002/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1186813 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186813 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/44 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
F16J15/442 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2002/49] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Berührungsfreie Axialkohlenstoffdichtung für ein Lagergehäuse | [2002/11] | English: | Contactless axial carbon seal for a bearing housing | [2002/11] | French: | Joint carbone axial sans contact pour une enceinte de palier | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 13.09.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.10.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0967424 (TECHSPACE AERO [BE]) [AD] 1,4-7 * column W *; | [AD]US5301957 (HWANG MING-FONG [US], et al) [AD] 1-3 * column 4, line 4 - column 7, line 2; figures 4,5 *; | [AD]US4398730 (RUECKER GERHARD [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [ADP]EP1055848 (TECHSPACE AERO [BE]) [ADP] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0818607 (ALLISON ENGINE CO INC [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0967424 | US5301957 | US4398730 | EP0818607 | EP0387122 | EP1055848 |