|
03.12.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
02.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
Reply to invitation to provide information on Prior Art |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2010 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Invitation to provide information on prior art |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2007 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |