Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9921217 | Global Dossier | 29.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6900140 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2005 | B2 | US2004175945 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80021604 | 12.03.2004 | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | BE9800159 | 22.10.1998 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | US53006900 | 03.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6844266 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2005 | B2 | US2003162407 | 28.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | US96784801 | 28.09.2001 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | US38827503 | 13.03.2003 | US53006900 | 03.07.2000 | US23656900 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5433374B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2014 | B2 | JP2010050477 | 04.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4430814B | Global Dossier | 10.03.2010 | B2 | JP2001521282 | 06.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | BE9800159 | 22.10.1998 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1353364 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2009 | B1 | EP1353364 | 14.04.2004 | A3 | EP1353364 | 15.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | EP98951122 | 22.10.1998 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | EP03076935 | 22.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1050074 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2004 | B1 | EP1050074 | 08.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | EP98951122 | 22.10.1998 | BE9800159 | 22.10.1998 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0911697 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1999 | A3 | EP0911697 | 28.04.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69821802T | 07.10.2004 | T2 | DE69821802D1 | 25.03.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | BE9800159 | 22.10.1998 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69840609D1 | 09.04.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7042091 | 09.05.2006 | B2 | US2001026956 | 04.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | US84495901 | 27.04.2001 | US8569198 | 27.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002076935 | 20.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | US96784801 | 28.09.2001 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | US53006900 | 03.07.2000 | US23656900 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6245489 | 12.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | US8569198 | 27.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6844267 | 18.01.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US7452498 | 12.02.1998 | US6348797 | 22.10.1997 | BE9800159 | 22.10.1998 | EP98870111 | 18.05.1998 | US53006900 | 03.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1195801 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2014 | B1 | EP1195801 | 03.06.2009 | A3 | EP1195801 | 10.04.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23656900 | 29.09.2000 |