EP1312666 - Processs for the destruction of securities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorghal asbl Rue Saint Victor 3 4500 Huy / BE | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapelle, Jean Saint Donat 2 4560 Pailhe / BE | 02 /
Bigare, Pascal Rue dans les Prés 13 5380 Fernelmont / BE | 03 /
Marche, Christian Rue de France 240 4550 Villers-Le-Temple / BE | 04 /
Wauthelet, Marc Wagnée 2A 5640 Biesme / BE | 05 /
Romedenne, Raphael Place Barbion 49 5502 Thynes / BE | 06 /
Hubin, Isabelle Rue de la Limite 107 4100 Seraing / BE | 07 /
Loix, Sophie Rue Maty 4 6230 Orbaix / BE | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 01870248.0 | 19.11.2001 | [2003/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312666 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/107 | [2003/21] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vernichtung von Wertpapieren | [2003/21] | English: | Processs for the destruction of securities | [2003/21] | French: | Procédé de destruction de valeurs mobilières | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 24.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0566056 (RECYCLING ENERGIE ABFALL [DE]) [X] 1 * page 1; figure 5; claim - *[Y] 2-4; | [XY]DE4446661 (B A N S BIOLOG ABFALL NUTZUNGS [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim - * [Y] 2-4; | [XY]DE19928663 (BEG BIOENERGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure .; claim - * [Y] 2-4 |