EP1221295 - Device for the selective connection of suction hoses of chip forming machine tools with a suction unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obendorf, Werner, Dr. Preglstrasse 18 4020 Linz / AT | [2002/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 01890003.5 | 05.01.2001 | [2002/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221295 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47L5/38, B08B15/00, B23Q11/00 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
B08B15/002 (EP);
B23Q11/0046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur wahlweisen Stömungsverbindung von Absaugleitungen spanabhebender Werkzeugmaschinen mit einem Sauggebläse | [2002/28] | English: | Device for the selective connection of suction hoses of chip forming machine tools with a suction unit | [2002/28] | French: | Dispositif pour la connexion sélective des tuyaux d'aspiration des machines d'usinage par enlèvement de copeaux avec un aspirateur | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 18.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5606767 (CRLENJAK JACK [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 11 - line 19 * * column 4, line 16 - column 6, line 3 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE3614117 (KOKSOPROJEKT [PL]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 10; figure - *; | [A]US4468017 (PAVONE ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 32; figures 6-8 *; | [A]GB287432 (HUMPREYS & GLASGOW LTD, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 31 - line 66; figure - *; | [DA]DE8905017U (HEIMER GMBH & CO LUFTTECHNIK KG) [DA] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 15 * * figure . *; | [A]JPS60101370 ; | [A]US2341531 (RODERICK DAND WILLIAM) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 46 - column R, line 50 * * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851005), vol. 009, no. 249, Database accession no. (M - 419), & JP60101370 A 19850605 (SANWA KASEI KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |