Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1188726 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1188726



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 55
22.06.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.12.2003 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.12.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 2
06.12.2003 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
31.10.2003 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
27.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
27.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.2003 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
08.07.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
07.07.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
13.01.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.11.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.11.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.11.2002 European search report Search / examination 2
10.06.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 4
10.06.2002 Priority document Search / examination 10
17.05.2002 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
06.02.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.12.2001 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
18.09.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
18.09.2001 Description Search / examination 4
18.09.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.09.2001 Drawings Search / examination 1
18.09.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8