blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1188726

EP1188726 - Aggregate, in particular for concrete, and process of production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.01.2004  [2004/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Partlic, Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Auweg 6
8652 Kindberg / AT
For all designated states
Trenkwalder, Anton
Rainhofsiedlung 39
8670 Krieglach / AT
[2002/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/12]
Representative(s)Dungler, Karin, et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer und Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Postfach 264
1071 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2002/12]Dungler, Karin, et al
c/o Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer und Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Lindengasse 8
1070 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date01890268.418.09.2001
[2002/12]
Priority number, dateAT2000000158818.09.2000         Original published format: AT 15882000
[2002/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1188726
Date:20.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1188726
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:C04B18/02
[2002/12]
CPC:
C04B18/021 (EP); C04B38/009 (EP); Y02W30/91 (EP)
C-Set:
C04B18/021, C04B14/06, C04B18/027 (EP);
C04B38/009, C04B14/06, C04B28/02, C04B38/02, C04B40/0263 (EP);
C04B38/009, C04B14/06, C04B28/02, C04B38/10, C04B40/0263 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   IT,   LI [2003/39]
Former [2002/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesSI04.07.2003
TitleGerman:Zuschlagstoff, insbesondere für Beton, sowie ein Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[2002/12]
English:Aggregate, in particular for concrete, and process of production[2002/12]
French:Agrégat, notamment pour béton, et procédé de fabrication[2002/12]
Examination procedure04.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
27.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
06.12.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.08.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB593309  (CECIL WHEATLEY STANCLIFFE);
 [X]DE855377  (CZERNILOFSKY FRANZ ING);
 [X]DE1296072  (WIENEN & THIEL GMBH);
 [X]DE2547908  (PERLMOOSER ZEMENTWERKE AG);
 [A]US4351670  (GRICE HAROLD E);
 [X]EP0069095  (THERMOBASE S N C [FR]);
 [X]EP0299482  (STEAG ENTSORGUNGS GMBH [DE]);
 [A]DE3816715  (HEHL ALOIS [DE]);
 [X]DE4340786  (MARIOTTI NORBERTO [DE]);
 [X]DE29823066U  (WUERZ SIEGFRIED [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.