|
24.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2002 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2002 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
09.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.04.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.01.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.01.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.01.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.08.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.07.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.07.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |