Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | CH | | CY | | DE | | DK | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | SE | | TR | | Examination procedure | 15.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | | 06.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 06.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | European patent granted | 24.09.2003 | Opposition procedure | 21.10.2005 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure | published on 11.01.2006 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 09.10.2002 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | | Event date: | 09.10.2002 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20020706 | | Event date: | 09.10.2002 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Event date: | 24.09.2003 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | | Event date: | 24.09.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 30.10.2003 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 50100676 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20031030 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 30.09.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | GERMAN | | Event date: | 26.01.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 04.02.2004 | | Event description: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 20040112 | | Event date: | 25.03.2004 | | Event description: | LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION | Effective DATE: | 20030924 | | Event date: | 28.04.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH | | Event date: | 30.04.2004 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 16.06.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2208543 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Event date: | 01.07.2004 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN | OWNER: | HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH | | Event date: | 30.07.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH | Free Format Text: | PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH#SICHELSTRASSE 1#30453 HANNOVER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH#SICHELSTRASSE 1#30453 HANNOVER (DE) | | Event date: | 30.07.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE | | Event date: | 25.08.2004 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | TESA AG | Effective DATE: | 20040624 | | Event date: | 01.10.2004 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | TESA AG | | Event date: | 01.10.2004 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1 | OWNER: | HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH | | Event date: | 31.08.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT PD4A | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP | Free Format Text: | HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH DE | Effective DATE: | 20040625 | | Event date: | 11.01.2006 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS TERMINATED | Effective DATE: | 20051021 | | Event date: | 01.03.2006 | | Event description: | NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION | Effective DATE: | 20051021 | | Event date: | 13.12.2006 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20061213 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 15.01.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20070115 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 12.01.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20070112 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 18.12.2006 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20061218 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 12.01.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20070112 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 12.12.2006 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20061212 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 10.01.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20070110 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 27.12.2006 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20061227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 29.08.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080131 | | Event date: | 01.09.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080108 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080708 | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080108 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080131 | | Event date: | 30.06.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080804 | | Event date: | 13.01.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 21.07.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT MM4A | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080708 | | Event date: | 30.07.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080108 | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH | Free Format Text: | HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH#SICHELSTRASSE 1#30453 HANNOVER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HENKEL PRITT PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH#SICHELSTRASSE 1#30453 HANNOVER (DE) | | Event date: | 30.09.2011 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100929 | | Event date: | 31.01.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080108 | | Event date: | 30.04.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20150129 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.04.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20150122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.04.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20150121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 29.05.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20150122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 29.05.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20150121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 29.05.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20150121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 21.01.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 02.02.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20030404937 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | | Event date: | 31.08.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 15.09.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 250548 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160108 | | Event date: | 28.09.2016 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20160108 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160108 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160131 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160131 | | Event date: | 02.11.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 30.11.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160109 | | Event date: | 30.11.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160108 | | Event date: | 30.12.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160108 | | Event date: | 31.01.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160108 | | Event date: | 20.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 19.01.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20200121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20200121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20200221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20200121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.06.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20200121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 08.08.2003 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 21.01.2003 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 25.04.2003 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 08.01.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 50100676 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 13.01.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20210107 | | Event date: | 19.03.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20210108 | | Event date: | 23.08.2002 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 25.11.2005 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: OPPOSITION PROCEDURE CLOSED | | Event date: | 06.09.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20210906 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20210109 | | Event date: | 25.11.2005 | | Event description: | TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE: DATE OF LEGAL EFFECT PUBLISHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009276 | | Event date: | 05.08.2005 | | Event description: | TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE: DECISION DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOPC1 | | Event date: | 11.04.2005 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 18.02.2005 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | | Event date: | 18.02.2005 | | Event description: | EXAMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OPPOSITION: INFORMATION RELATED TO DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION + TIME LIMIT DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDOPE2 | | Event date: | 18.02.2005 | | Event description: | EXAMINATION OF ADMISSIBILITY OF OPPOSITION: INFORMATION RELATED TO RECEIPT OF REPLY DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDOPE4 | | Event date: | 18.02.2005 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION WITHDRAWN | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009264 | | Event date: | 18.02.2005 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 18.01.2005 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 10.09.2004 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 10.07.2004 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |