EP1246768 - DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING A SUBSTANCE APPLIED TO A SUPPORT TAPE IN THE FORM OF A FILM TO A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Pritt Produktionsgesellschaft mbH Sichelstrasse 1 30453 Hannover / DE | [2004/18] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Pritt Produktionsgesellschaft mbH Sichelstrasse 1 30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEBENSEE, Ingo Kriegerstrasse 43 30161 Hannover / DE | 02 /
HERRMANNSEN, Wulf Rebhuhnweg 16 30952 Ronnenberg / DE | 03 /
BARTLING, Oliver Droehnenstrasse 33 30455 Hannover / DE | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | Mathes, Nikolaus, Dr. Henkel KGaA, Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01900137.9 | 08.01.2001 | [2002/41] | WO2001EP00127 | Priority number, date | DE20001001465 | 15.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10001465 | [2002/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0151394 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1246768 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246768 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H37/00 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
B65H37/007 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1705 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1795 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN EINES IN FORM EINES FILMES AUF EIN TRÄGERBAND AUFGEBRACHTEN STOFFES AUF EIN SUBSTRAT | [2002/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING A SUBSTANCE APPLIED TO A SUPPORT TAPE IN THE FORM OF A FILM TO A SUBSTRATE | [2002/41] | French: | APPAREIL SERVANT AU TRANSFERT SUR UN SUBSTRAT D'UNE SUBSTANCE SE PRESENTANT SOUS LA FORME D'UN FILM RECOUVRANT UNE BANDE SUPPORT | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2004
09.02.2005
WITHDRAWN tesa AG Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2005/14] |
Former [2004/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2004
WITHDRAWN tesa AG Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | 14.09.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 21.10.2005 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4853074 (MANUSCH CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 10, line 45 - column 11, line 15; figure 4D *; | [AD]EP0360045 (PELIKAN AG [DE]) [AD] 1* column W *; | [AD]US5430904 (ONO MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 64 - line 68 * * column 8, line 40 - line 66; figures 3,5,6 * | by applicant | EP0360045 | US5430904 |