11.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
26.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
21.09.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
24.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
10.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
29.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
22.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
18.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
10.11.2006 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
13.10.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
11.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.09.2006 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
29.09.2006 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.09.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
05.07.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.07.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
24.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
24.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
04.03.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
30.08.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
30.08.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
26.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|