EP1299009 - PASTA AND METHOD FOR MAKING PASTA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEVE de MEVERGNIES, Jean Rue Victor-Hugo 11 54190 Tiercelet / FR | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Petsis, Christos, et al 4-6, Kyparissias 542 49 Thessaloniki / GR | [2003/15] | Application number, filing date | 01900342.5 | 08.01.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001BE00002 | Priority number, date | WO2000BE00078 | 04.07.2000 Original published format: PCT/BE00/00078 | BE20000000659 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: BE 200000659 | [2003/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0201965 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1299009 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/16, A21C9/04 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
A21C9/04 (EP);
A23L7/109 (EP);
A23L7/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEIGWARE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/15] | English: | PASTA AND METHOD FOR MAKING PASTA | [2003/15] | French: | PATES ALIMENTAIRES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PATES ALIMENTAIRES | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 17.04.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/07] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/07] | Request for further processing for: | 01.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 01.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.05.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.2005 | 31.01.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9607332 (J. NEVE DE MEVERGNIES) [X] 1-13,15-17 * figures 1-6 * * claims 1,10 * * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 27 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 1 *; | [XD]LU85656 (J. NEVE DE MEVERGNIES) [XD] 1-6,8,10,12,14-17 * page 2, line 7 - line 11 * * page 3, line 22 - line 27 *; | [X]DE4000682 (RUETGERSWERKE AG) [X] 1,12,15-17,19 * claims 1,2,6-8,10 * * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 48 *; | [X]US4769247 (ROTHENBERG JOAN R ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-11,13,14,16,17 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 58 *; | [X]JPH02242650 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901213), vol. 014, no. 562, Database accession no. (C - 0788), & JP02242650 A 19900927 (NIPPON FLOUR MILLS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,12,15-17,19 * abstract * |