EP1252462 - SCREW-THREADED PIPE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HSC FZCO East Wing Building 2 Office 105 Dubai Airport Free Zone Area Dubai / AE | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states HSC S.A.L. WAKF Grec Orthodox Building No. 286 Place de L'étoile (Parlement) Maarad Street Beirut / LB | ||
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states HSC S.A.L. WAKF Grec Orthodox Building No. 286, CPlace de L'etoile (Parlement), Maarad Street Beirut / LB | ||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states HSC S.A.L. WAKF Grec Orthodox Building No. 286, CPlace de L'etoile (Parlement), Maarad Street Beirut / LB | ||
For all designated states Hignett, Ian Harold Hy'tek House, Main Cross Road Great Yarmouth, Norfolk NR30 3PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGNETT, Ian Harold Hy'tek House Main Cross Road Great Yarmouth Norfolk NR30 3PD / GB | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Paul Richard, et al Novagraaf Norwich Limited Willow Lane House Willow Lane Norwich NR2 1EU / GB | [2006/03] |
Former [2003/13] | Wilson, Peter, et al William Jones Limited Willow Lane House Willow Lane Norwich Norfolk NR2 1EU / GB | ||
Former [2002/44] | Flynn, Michael Joseph, et al William Jones, Willow Lane House, Willow Lane Norwich, Norfolk NR2 1EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01900517.2 | 12.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001GB00113 | Priority number, date | GB20000000642 | 13.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0000642 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0151840 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1252462 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252462 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16L15/06, E21B17/042 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
F16L15/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/45] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 04.07.2002 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRAUBGEWINDEROHRVERBINDUNG | [2002/44] | English: | SCREW-THREADED PIPE JOINT | [2002/44] | French: | JOINT DE TUYAU VISSE | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2008
14.04.2008
ADMISSIBLE VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE 54, rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR Opponent's representative Marsolais, Richard, et al, et al Vallourec & Mannesmann Tubes Département Propriété Industrielle 27, avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2011/38] |
Former [2008/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2008
VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE 54, rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR Opponent's representative Pellicani, Félix Angelo Vallourec & Mannesman Tubes Division Propriété Industrielle 27 Avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02.05.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.07.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/50] | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2003 | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2005 | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.06.2007 | CH | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | LI | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | DE | 14.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | LU | 12.01.2008 | IE | 14.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
LU | 12.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
DE | 14.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 13.06.2007 | |
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2258066 (ERLING OYEN) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]GB1515357 (NOVA HUT KLEMENTA GOTTWALDA) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 111 - page 2, line 130; figures 2-4 * [Y] 6-13; | [Y]US4377302 (KOHYAMA FUZIMASA [JP], et al) [Y] 6-9* column 3, line 42 - column 3, line 49; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4538840 (DELANGE RICHARD W [US]) [Y] 6-9 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US4732416 (DEARDEN GEOFFREY C [GB], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 53 - column 5, line 68; figure 10 * [Y] 6-13; | [Y]EP0916883 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [Y] 10-13 * page 6, line 12 - page 6, line 17; figures TABLES,2,4 * |