EP1161271 - METHOD FOR EMPTYING A BLOOD CIRCUIT OF AN APPARATUS FOR THE EXTRACORPOREAL TREATMENT OF BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAMBRO HOSPAL (Schweiz) AG Pfluggässlein 2 4001 Basel / CH | [2002/18] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states HOSPAL AG Dornacherstrasse 8 4008 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDRAZZI, Renato Via S. Martino Carano, 84 I-41037 Mirandola / IT | 02 /
ROVATTI, Paolo Via Cassetti, 38 I-41034 Finale Emilia / IT | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Ponzellini, Gian-Marco, et al Gambro Legal and Intellectual Property Dept. P.O. Box 98 41037 Mirandola / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Ponzellini, Gianmarco, et al Gambro Legal and Intellectual Property Dept. P.O. Box 98 41037 Mirandola / IT | ||
Former [2008/38] | Lejeune, Daniel, et al Gambro Patent Department 7 Avenue Lionel Terray 69883 Meyzieu Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | Lejeune, Daniel, et al Gambro Patent Department 7 Avenue Lionel Terray 69883 Meyzieu cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/50] | Villanova, Massimo, et al Gambro Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 98 41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT | ||
Former [2004/10] | Sutto, Luca, et al Gambro Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 98 41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT | ||
Former [2003/23] | Sutto, Luca, et al Gambro Intellectual Property Department No. 66, via Modenese 41036 Medolla / IT | ||
Former [2001/50] | Lejeune, Daniel Hospal Service Brevets, 61, avenue Tony Garnier 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 01900572.7 | 12.01.2001 | [2001/50] | WO2001IB00027 | Priority number, date | IT2000TO00025 | 12.01.2000 Original published format: IT TO000025 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0151106 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161271 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161271 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1161271 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, A61M1/16 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
A61M1/3643 (EP,US);
A61M1/1601 (EP,US);
A61M1/3644 (EP,US);
A61M1/3646 (EP,US);
A61M1/365 (EP,US);
A61M1/3652 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP);
A61M2205/3351 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3355 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTLEEREN EINES BLUTKREISLAUFS IN EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR EXTRAKORPORALEN BLUTBEHANDLUNG | [2001/50] | English: | METHOD FOR EMPTYING A BLOOD CIRCUIT OF AN APPARATUS FOR THE EXTRACORPOREAL TREATMENT OF BLOOD | [2001/50] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A VIDER LE CIRCUIT SANGUIN D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT EXTRACORPOREL DU SANG | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 22.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.2006
11.01.2011
WITHDRAWN Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Dreyhsig, Jörg, et al, et al Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA Global Intellectual Property Frankfurter Strasse 6-8 66606 St. Wendel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.2006
11.01.2011
WITHDRAWN Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Dreyhsig, Jörg, et al, et al Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA Patent Department Frankfurter Strasse 6-8 66606 St. Wendel / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.2006
WITHDRAWN Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Dreyhsig, Jörg, et al, et al Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA Patent Department Frankfurter Strasse 6-8 66606 St. Wendel / DE | 14.06.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.06.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.10.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 02.03.2009 | Appeal received No. T0536/09 | 07.05.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.03.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2005 | BE | 10.08.2005 | CH | 10.08.2005 | CY | 10.08.2005 | FI | 10.08.2005 | LI | 10.08.2005 | NL | 10.08.2005 | TR | 10.08.2005 | DK | 10.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | SE | 10.11.2005 | PT | 10.01.2006 | IE | 12.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
TR | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
TR | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9015631 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 14 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0720856 (MEDICAL SUPPORT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 7, line 21 - line 24 * * column 7, line 42 - line 44 * * column 10, line 6 - line 8 ** figures 4-6 *; | [A]US5776091 (BRUGGER JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 7, line 1 - line 6 * * column 7, line 42 - line 49 * * column 9, line 6 - line 9 * * column 9, line 37 - line 57 * * figures 2,3,7 *; | [A]US5932103 (KENLEY RODNEY S [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | Opposition | DE3442744 | DE19704564 |