EP1173709 - SAFETY LIGHTER WITH COMPOUND FINGER PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chung, Aman Kai Man Wah Lai Ind. Centre, Unit 1, 11F 10-14 Kwei Tei Street Fo-Tan, Shatin New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | [2011/36] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Chung, Aman Kai Man Wah Lai Ind. Centre, Unit 1, 11F 10-14 Kwei Tei Street Fo Tan, Shatin New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01900836.6 | 03.01.2001 | [2002/04] | WO2001US00124 | Priority number, date | US20000477336 | 04.01.2000 Original published format: US 477336 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0150063 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1173709 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173709 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/36 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
F23Q2/164 (EP,US);
F23Q2/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/04] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSFEUERZEUG MIT ZUSAMMENGESETZTEM PRESSPOLSTER | [2002/04] | English: | SAFETY LIGHTER WITH COMPOUND FINGER PAD | [2002/04] | French: | BRIQUET DE SECURITE A COUSSINET TACTILE COMPOSE | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2011 | BE | 14.09.2011 | CY | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | IT | 14.09.2011 | NL | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | ES | 25.12.2011 | GB | 03.01.2012 | IE | 03.01.2012 | LU | 03.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | FR | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
GB | 03.01.2012 | ||
IE | 03.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
GB | 03.01.2012 | ||
IE | 03.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
GB | 03.01.2012 | ||
IE | 03.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
GB | 03.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
FR | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
GB | 03.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
GB | 03.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 14.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US6095796 (SUNG KIL YONG [US]) [PX] 1-6* the whole document * | International search | [X]ES2015769 (IND DE FOSFOROS Y ENCENDEDORES [ES]); | [A]US5145358 (SHIKE TSUTOMU [JP], et al); | [X]WO9946539 (CALICO BRANDS INC [US], et al); | [A]US5997282 (MAN AMAN CHUNG KAI [HK]) | by applicant | WO9946539 | ES19890002796 |