EP1258726 - METHOD OF DETECTING OR QUANTIFYING ENVIRONMENTAL HORMONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [2007/25] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINEGISHI, Takashi 2-8-3, Ohtone-machi Maebashi-shi, Gunma 371-0825 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Kaoru 711-8, Shimoshinden-machi Maebashi-shi, Gunma 371-0822 / JP | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Harding, Charles Thomas D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01901448.9 | 19.01.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001JP00329 | Priority number, date | JP20000011329 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000011329 | [2002/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0153823 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1258726 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1258726 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/76, G01N33/50 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/5014 (EP,US);
G01N33/5023 (EP,US);
G01N33/5044 (EP,US);
G01N33/76 (EP,US);
G01N2333/59 (EP,US);
G01N2333/726 (EP,US);
G01N2430/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/47] | G01N33/00, G01N31/00, C12Q1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | 12.08.2002 | LT | 12.08.2002 | LV | 12.08.2002 | MK | 12.08.2002 | RO | 12.08.2002 | SI | 12.08.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERKENNEN ODER QUANTIFIZIEREN VON UMWELTHORMONEN | [2002/47] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING OR QUANTIFYING ENVIRONMENTAL HORMONES | [2002/47] | French: | RECHERCHE OU DOSAGE DE PERTURBATEURS ENDOCRINIENS | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2002 | Translation filed | 12.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.06.2007 | BE | 20.06.2007 | CH | 20.06.2007 | CY | 20.06.2007 | DK | 20.06.2007 | FI | 20.06.2007 | IT | 20.06.2007 | LI | 20.06.2007 | NL | 20.06.2007 | TR | 20.06.2007 | SE | 20.09.2007 | GR | 21.09.2007 | ES | 01.10.2007 | PT | 20.11.2007 | GB | 19.01.2008 | LU | 19.01.2008 | IE | 21.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | FR | 22.02.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
CY | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
GB | 19.01.2008 | ||
LU | 19.01.2008 | ||
IE | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
CY | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
GB | 19.01.2008 | ||
IE | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
GB | 19.01.2008 | ||
IE | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
GB | 19.01.2008 | ||
IE | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
GB | 19.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
NL | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 20.06.2007 | |
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4764502 (DIZEREGA GERE S [US]) [X] 10,11 * example 10; claim 3 *; | [XA] - YOSHIDA SEIICHI ET AL, "Exposure to diesel exhaust affects the male reproductive system of mice", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ANDROLOGY, (199910), vol. 22, no. 5, ISSN 0105-6263, pages 307 - 315, XP002324187 [X] 11 * page 307, column 2, lines 8-11 * * page 310, column 2, paragraphs 2,3; figure 4 * * page 312, column 2, paragraph L - page 313, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 314, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2605.1999.00185.x | [X] - LEFAUCHEUR C ET AL, "[Inhibin and cybernins]", PATHOLOGIE-BIOLOGIE. OCT 1982, (198210), vol. 30, no. 8, ISSN 0369-8114, pages 727 - 736, XP009046557 [X] 11 * abstract * * page 732, paragraph 8 - page 733, paragraph 2 * | [X] - YANG K P ET AL, "Characterization of an inhibitor for luteinizing hormone receptor site binding.", ENDOCRINOLOGY. JAN 1976, (197601), vol. 98, no. 1, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 233 - 241, XP009046558 [X] 11 * the whole document * | [PX] - HIRAKAWA TAKASHI ET AL, "Effect of 2,3,7,8-tetrachlorodibenzo-p-dioxin on the expression of luteinizing hormone receptors during cell differentiation in cultured granulosa cells", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (20000315), vol. 375, no. 2, ISSN 0003-9861, pages 371 - 376, XP002324190 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abbi.1999.1678 | International search | [A]WO9310460 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]); | [A]EP0678577 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [A] - SHINICHIRO KAWAI ET AL., "Suushu no baiyou saibou wo mochiita naibunpitsu kakuran busshitsu no screening", KANKYOU GIJUTSU, (1999), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 300 - 306, XP002955576 | [A] - KOUCHI KURODA, "Kankyou hormone/kankyou estrogen", KANKYOU GIJUTSU, (1998), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 895 - 900, XP002955577 | [A] - HIDEO KANEKO ET AL., "Josei hormone you busshitsu no kenshutsu kei", KAGAKU, (1998), vol. 68, no. 7, pages 598 - 605, XP002955578 |