EP1164329 - LIGHT SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu General Limited 1116, Suenaga, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 213-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Fujitsu General Limited 1116, Suenaga, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 213-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBIKO, Naoki, c/o Fujitsu General Ltd 1116, Suenaga, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8502 / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2001/51] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01901462.0 | 19.01.2001 | [2001/51] | WO2001JP00345 | Priority number, date | JP20000011261 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000011261 | [2001/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0153743 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164329 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/06, F21S2/00, F21Y101/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
F21V7/09 (EP,US);
F21S41/333 (EP,US);
F21S8/00 (EP,US);
F21V7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLE | [2001/51] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE | [2001/51] | French: | SOURCE DE LUMIERE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2001 | Translation filed | 05.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 15.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS422233Y ; | [A]GB2079435 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]JPH01253101 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [A]JPH11273431 (OSE KK, et al); | [A]JPH11329032 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) |