EP1175006 - LONGITUDINAL COUPLING SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epson Toyocom Corporation 421-8, Hino Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8501 / JP | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT CO. LTD. 1-1, Koyato 2-chome, Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun Kanagawa 253-0192 / JP | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT CO. LTD. 1-1, Koyato 2-chome, Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun, Kanagawa 253-0192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Naoki Toyo Com. Equipment Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koyato 2-chome Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun Kanagawa 253-0192 / JP | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01901488.5 | 22.01.2001 | [2002/04] | WO2001JP00378 | Priority number, date | JP20000020779 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000020779 | [2002/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0156151 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175006 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175006 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/64, H03H9/145 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
H03H9/6469 (EP,US);
H03H9/0061 (EP,US);
H03H9/14538 (EP,US);
H03H9/14576 (EP,US);
H03H9/14582 (EP,US);
H03H9/14585 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2002/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHESOBERFLÄCHENWELLENFILTER MIT LONGITUDINALER KOPPELUNG | [2002/04] | English: | LONGITUDINAL COUPLING SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE FILTER | [2002/04] | French: | FILTRE A ONDES ACOUSTIQUES DE SURFACE A COUPLAGE LONGITUDINAL | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2001 | Translation filed | 25.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 07.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.03.2007 | FR | 21.03.2007 | SE | 21.06.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/24] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
FR | 23.11.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 21.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19638399 (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 9 - line 12 *; | [A]EP0871288 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figure 4 * | International search | [A]JPH10290141 (TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIP); | [AP]JP2000049558 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |