21.12.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
10.09.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.03.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.08.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.06.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.09.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
18.04.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.04.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.11.2006 |
First examination report |
|
08.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
07.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
31.01.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
31.01.2003 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
31.01.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
21.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|