EP1290579 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATICALLY CONVERTING THE FORMAT OF AN ELECTRONIC MESSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contivo, Inc. Suite 103, 2483 East Bayshore Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMM, Douglas, Cameron 795 Aaron Park Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
LECKIE, Donald, Albert 34 Greatstone Drive Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2003/11] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01901700.3 | 02.01.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001US00165 | Priority number, date | US20000588270 | 05.06.2000 Original published format: US 588270 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0195135 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1290579 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
G06F40/247 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99943 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE UND GERÄT ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN KONVERTIERUNG DES FORMATS EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN NACHRICHT | [2003/11] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATICALLY CONVERTING THE FORMAT OF AN ELECTRONIC MESSAGE | [2003/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONVERSION AUTOMATIQUE DU FORMAT D'UN MESSAGE ELECTRONIQUE | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0454303 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 47 - line 55; figure 6 * * abstract *; | [A]US5708828 (COLEMAN J TODD [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 31 * * column 9, line 48 - line 54 * * column 11, line 40 - column 14, line 14 * * column 16, line 32 - line 41 * * abstract *; | [A]US5715397 (OGAWA STUART S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 15, line 55 - column 16, line 65 * * abstract *; | [X]US5794234 (CHURCH CRAIG A [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 15 * * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 20; figures 4A,,4B *; | [X]WO9856024 (CROSSMAR INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 28, line 30 - line 33 * * page 103, line 16 - line 33 * * abstract *; | [A]US5909570 (WEBBER DAVID R R [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US6032147 (WILLIAMS DALE L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 29; figures 3B,9A-11B * * abstract *; | [A] - "GENERIC DATABASE INTERFACE", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (19901001), no. 318, ISSN 0374-4353, page 794, XP000148635 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - LIANG J ET AL, "Synthesis of consolidated data schema for engineering analysis from multiple STEP application protocols", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (199906), vol. 31, no. 7, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 429 - 447, XP004172466 [A] 1-15 * page 431, column L, paragraph 2 - page 432, column L, paragraph 5 * * page 441, column R, paragraph 2 - page 443, column L, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0010-4485(99)00041-X |