EP1157512 - APPROACH FOR PROCESSING DATA RECEIVED FROM A COMMUNICATIONS CHANNEL IN FINITE PRECISION ARITHMETIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ninel Technology, LLC 160 Greentree Drive, Suite 101 Dover, DE 19904 / US | [2009/49] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Bandspeed, Inc. 7000 West William Cannon Drive, Suite 2220 Austin, TX 78735 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORM, Andrew 4/2 Launder Street Hawthorn, VIC 3122 / AU | 02 /
TONISSEN, Shane, Michael 20 Ayr Street Ascot Vale, VIC 3032 / AU | 03 /
SKAFIDAS, Efstratios 10 Kelson Street Coburg, VIC 3057 / AU | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/18] | Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/48] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01901702.9 | 02.01.2001 | [2001/48] | WO2001US00169 | Priority number, date | US19990173785P | 30.12.1999 Original published format: US 173785 P | US19990173778P | 30.12.1999 Original published format: US 173778 P | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0150697 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157512 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/00, H04L27/26, H04L25/03 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
H04L25/03038 (EP,US);
H04L27/00 (KR);
H04L25/03076 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03477 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03484 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSKANAL EMPFANGENEN DATEN BEI ANWENDUNGEN BEGRENZTER ARITHMETISCHER PRÄZISION | [2001/48] | English: | APPROACH FOR PROCESSING DATA RECEIVED FROM A COMMUNICATIONS CHANNEL IN FINITE PRECISION ARITHMETIC APPLICATIONS | [2001/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES RECUES DEPUIS UN CANAL DE COMMUNICATION DANS DES APPLICATIONS ARITHMETIQUES A PRECISION FINIE | [2001/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/48] | 25.10.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2011 | 22.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed | Examination | US3617948 | DE19843145 |