EP1252036 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTIVE HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azure Dynamics Inc. 3650 Wesbrook Mall Vancouver British Columbia V6S 2L2 / CA | [2006/11] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Azure Dynamics Inc. 3650 Wesbrook Mall Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 2L2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROZDZ, Piotr 1159 The Castings Vancouver, British Columbia V6H 3P6 / CA | 02 /
ZETTEL, Andrew 4986 Wycliffe Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1G1 / CA | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Gritschneder, Martin, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Gritschneder, Martin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01902208.6 | 30.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001CA00101 | Priority number, date | US20000494812 | 31.01.2000 Original published format: US 494812 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154940 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1252036 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252036 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/20, B60L11/12 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
B60L58/13 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60L15/2045 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/62 (EP,US);
B60L58/24 (EP);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W20/11 (US);
B60W50/0097 (EP);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/443 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,US);
B60L2250/10 (EP,US);
B60L2250/16 (EP,US);
B60L2260/42 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0031 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y02T10/84 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES HYBRIDFAHRZEUG UND STEUERUNG | [2002/44] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTIVE HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL | [2002/44] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINE A LA COMMANDE DE VEHICULE HYBRIDE ET ADAPTATIF | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 24.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | BE | 15.03.2006 | CH | 15.03.2006 | CY | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | LI | 15.03.2006 | NL | 15.03.2006 | TR | 15.03.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | SE | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | PT | 16.08.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
CY | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10307807 ; | [A]EP0543390 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] * column 6, line 31 - line 40 * * claim 7 *; | [A]US5282641 (MCLAUGHLIN RICHARD J [US]) [A] * abstract ** column 7, line 17 - line 38 *; | [A]EP0699554 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] * abstract * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0811757 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5883481 (ITO HISAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US5898282 (DROZDZ PIOTR [CA], et al) [A] 1,6,8-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 26 * * claims 1-5 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5939794 (SAKAI SHOJI [JP], et al); | [YA] - HOEHN VON B -R ET AL, "AUSLEGUNGSKRITERIEN UND BETRIEBSSTRATEGIE FUER DEN ELEKTROMOTOR IM AUTARKEN HYBRID", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT,DE,FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG. STUTTGART, (19971101), vol. 99, no. 11, ISSN 0001-2785, pages 720 - 725, XP000750785 [Y] 1,2,7,8,11 * the whole document * [A] 6 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10307807 A 19981117 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1,2,7,8,11 * abstract * |