EP1270615 - ETHYLENE-BASE COPOLYMERS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Yokoami 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0015 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGAWA, Tatsuya 1-1, Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | 02 /
MINAMI, Yutaka 1-1, Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01902808.3 | 08.02.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001JP00883 | Priority number, date | JP20000031589 | 09.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000031589 | [2003/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0158968 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1270615 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F4/60, C10M107/02, C10M143/00, C10N20/00, C10N20/04, C10N30/02, C10N40/25 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C10M107/04 (EP,US);
C10M143/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0225 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US);
C10N2020/011 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/03 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/03 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/17 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2003/01] | C08F210/16, C08F4/60, C10M107/02, C10M143/00, // (C10N20/00, 20:04, 30:02, 40:25) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | COPOLYMERE AUF ETHYLENBASIS, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN | [2003/01] | English: | ETHYLENE-BASE COPOLYMERS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME | [2003/01] | French: | COPOLYMERES A BASE D'ETHYLENE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET HUILES LUBRIFIANTES LES CONTENANT | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2002 | Translation filed | 15.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0632066 (SPHERILENE SRL [IT]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1,8,9 *; | [X]US4704491 (TSUTSUI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9-11 * claims 1-3 *; | [DA] - H. N. CHENG, "13C NMR Characterization of Ethylene/1-Butene Copolymers", MACROMOLECULES, (1991), vol. 24, pages 4813 - 4819, XP002308076 [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00017a013 | [PX] - T. UOZUMI, C.H. AHN, M. TOMISAKA, J. JIN, G. TIAN, T. SANO,K. SOGA, "Synthesis of ethylene-alpha-olefin alternating copolymers with Et(1-ind)(9-Flu)ZrCl2-MAO catalyst system", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, (2000), vol. 201, pages 1748 - 1752, XP002308077 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3935(20000901)201:14<1748::AID-MACP1748>3.0.CO;2-I | International search | [XP]JP2000072825 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [X]EP0721954 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [X]EP0818458 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0422859 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]); | [Y]EP0129414 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [AP]JP2000351813 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) |