EP1229632 - MOTOR EQUIPPED WITH ROTATION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation 2681, Hirosawacho 1-chome Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation 2681, Hirosawacho 1-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma 376-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA, Masayuki 786-1, Ishibashicho Ohta-shi, Gunma 373-0007 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Isao 1-21, Miyakitacho Ashikaga-shi, Tochigi 326-0027 / JP | 03 /
HAGIWARA, Yuji 38-1, Umedacho 5-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma 376-0601 / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Chameroy, Claude Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Chameroy, Claude c/o Cabinet Malémont 42, avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/21] | Hud, Robert, et al Cabinet COLLIGNON 15 rue de Surène 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/15] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/32] | Hud, Robert Cabinet COLLIGNON 15 rue de Surène 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01902814.1 | 08.02.2001 | [2002/32] | WO2001JP00899 | Priority number, date | JP20000148912 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000148912 | [2002/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0189064 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229632 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
H02K11/21 (EP,US);
H02K11/215 (EP,US);
H02K23/66 (EP,US);
H02K29/08 (EP,US);
H02K5/148 (EP,US);
H02K7/1166 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/22] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MIT EINEM DREHSENSOR AUSGESTATTER MOTOR | [2002/32] | English: | MOTOR EQUIPPED WITH ROTATION SENSOR | [2002/32] | French: | MOTEUR EQUIPE D'UN DETECTEUR DE ROTATION | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2002 | Translation filed | 19.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8811966U ; | [A]WO9213381 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]); | [X]WO9810971 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al); | [X]EP0865148 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]DE19710015 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | International search | [Y]JPS6450647U ; | [X]JPH01147672U ; | [Y]JPH09226527 (JIDOSHA DENKI KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2000060053 (MINEBEA CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000121385 (ASMO CO LTD) |