Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003522283 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR0100116 | 29.01.2001 | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3062501 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR0100116 | 29.01.2001 | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1259586 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2003 | A4 | EP1259586 | 27.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR0100116 | 29.01.2001 | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0108385 | 18.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR0100116 | 29.01.2001 | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0159049 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100357709B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2002 | B1 | KR20000024335 | 06.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1406272 | 26.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003069152 | 10.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 |