EP1259586 - MULTIPURPOSE, MULTIFUNCTIONAL COMPLEX CLEANING AND WASHING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amechem Inc. 1-513, College of Engineering, Jeonnam National University, 300 Yongbong-dong, Buk-gu Kwangju 500-757 / KR | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dai-Uk 18/1, No. 479-13, Amsa-dong, Kangdong-gu Seoul 134-050 / KR | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2002/48] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01902861.2 | 29.01.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001KR00116 | Priority number, date | KR20000005875 | 09.02.2000 Original published format: KR 2000005875 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0159049 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259586 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/83, C11D1/00, C11D1/66, C11D1/38 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/00 (KR);
C11D3/2068 (EP,US);
C11D1/146 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D1/722 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALLZWECKREINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2002/48] | English: | MULTIPURPOSE, MULTIFUNCTIONAL COMPLEX CLEANING AND WASHING AGENT | [2002/48] | French: | AGENT COMPLEXE DE LAVAGE ET NETTOYAGE POLYVALENT ET MULTIUSAGE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 06.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 05.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3429822 (GRUNEWALD HELMUT, et al) [A] 1* example -; claim - *; | [YA]US4395365 (HASEGAWA MASAMI [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * column 2, lines 13-37; example - * [A] 1; | [A]US5567348 (NOZAWA MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * examples 1,4 *; | [YA]US5786319 (PEDERSEN KIMBERLY M [US], et al) [Y] 3 * claim -; table 1 * [A] 1; | [Y]WO9833881 (HENKEL ECOLAB GMBH & CO OHG [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * examples 12,17-19 *; | [Y]US5821213 (BURKE JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 67; claim - * * example - *; | [A]US5994287 (MERTENS BAUDOUIN [BE], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, lines 8-51; examples 1A-C,2A-C * * column 6, lines 14-19 * | International search | [A]US4786431 (BROZE GUY [BE], et al); | [Y]JPH05287298 (LION CORP); | [A]JPH07118689 (LION CORP); | [Y]JPH0892592 (ELF ATOCHEM JAPAN KK); | [Y]US5705476 (HOFFARTH GUNTHER [DE]); | [Y]JPH11279600 (KAO CORP) |