EP1246755 - SLIDER FOR A RECLOSABLE FASTENER LYING IN A TWO DIMENSIONAL PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUPP, Matthew Todd 11375 Marlett Dr. Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [2002/49] |
Former [2002/41] | 01 /
HUPP, Matthew Todd Apt. 3, 11624 Timber Ridge Lane Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | Representative(s) | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto Via Aterno 128/130 Sambuceto 66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 92/94 66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | Application number, filing date | 01903024.6 | 11.01.2001 | [2002/41] | WO2001US00858 | Priority number, date | US20000480909 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: US 480909 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0151361 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1246755 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246755 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1246755 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/00 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
B65D43/162 (EP);
B65D33/25 (KR);
B65D33/2541 (EP,KR,US);
B65D43/00 (KR);
A44B19/16 (EP);
A44B19/267 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/01] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBER FÜR WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBAREN VERSCHLUSS MIT ZWEIDIMENSIONALEM VERLAUF | [2002/41] | English: | SLIDER FOR A RECLOSABLE FASTENER LYING IN A TWO DIMENSIONAL PLANE | [2002/41] | French: | GLISSIERE D'APPLICATION D'EFFORTS D'OUVERTURE OU DE FERMETURE A UNE ATTACHE SE TROUVANT DANS UN PLAN BIDIMENSIONNEL | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]BE505325 (PROUVOST & CIE S.A.R.L.) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,6; | [PX]WO0064772 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1* figures 1,4 * | by applicant | US3660875 | US3784055 | US3967756 | US5662758 | US5871067 | US19390967453 | US19400967453 |