EP1872667 - MICROWAVE COOKED SNACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borges, S.A. Calle Notario Rull, 41 E-43205 Reus / ES | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURAN VILA, Juan Ramon Calle Notario Rull, 41 E-43205 Reus / ES | 02 /
GOMEZ ARROYO, Fatima Calle Notario Rull, 41 E-43205 Reus / ES | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Gislon, Gabriele Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/ Bruc 21 1, 3a 08010 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2009/23] | Gislon, Gabriele TORNER, JUNCOSA I ASSOCIATS, S.L. Bruc 21 1º 3º 08010 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2008/01] | Taliercio, Antonio Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 01903807.4 | 12.02.2001 | [2008/01] | WO2001ES00048 | Priority number, date | ES20000001465 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: ES 200001465 | [2008/01] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0193695 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1872667 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1872667 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/18, A23L1/2165 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
B65D81/3461 (EP,US);
A23L7/135 (EP,US);
A23L7/165 (EP,US);
B65D2581/3428 (EP,US);
B65D2581/3494 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/01] | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENGEGARTES SNACKPRODUKT | [2008/01] | English: | MICROWAVE COOKED SNACK | [2008/01] | French: | APERITIF DE CUISSON AU MICRO-ONDES | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2003 | Translation filed | 16.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/09] | 14.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | 16.01.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2007 | 28.02.2014 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0836807 (ULICE [FR]); | [Y]US4251551 (VANHULLE GLENN J, et al); | [Y]EP0338239 (SHORT MILLING CO J [US]) |