EP1256152 - FLEXIBLE SEAL FOR A CABLE THROUGH HOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fibox Oy Ab Jorvaksenniitty 02420 Jorvas / FI | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROPPONEN, Matti Suvikuja 4 A 12 FIN-02120 Espoo / FI | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Roitto, Klaus Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Roitto, Klaus Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01903842.1 | 01.02.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001FI00095 | Priority number, date | FI20000000241 | 04.02.2000 Original published format: FI 20000241 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0157981 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256152 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/22, H02G15/013, H01R13/52 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
F16L5/10 (EP);
H02G3/22 (EP,KR);
H02G15/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE ABDICHTUNG FÜR KABELDURCHFÜHRUNGSÖFFNUNG | [2002/46] | English: | FLEXIBLE SEAL FOR A CABLE THROUGH HOLE | [2002/46] | French: | MOYEN D'ETANCHEITE FLEXIBLE POUR TROU DE PASSAGE DE CABLE | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1470298 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M); | [A]US5360945 (TRUESDALE JR ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]GB2191899 (AMP INC) | Examination | FR2402323 |