EP1163471 - LIGHTING STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. L.D. 29 rue Bazin 14990 Bernières-sur-Mer / FR | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEDE, Denis 29 rue Bazin F-14990 Bernières-sur-Mer / FR | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01903862.9 | 03.01.2001 | [2001/51] | WO2001FR00017 | Priority number, date | FR20000000091 | 05.01.2000 Original published format: FR 0000091 | [2001/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0150062 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163471 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163471 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F21S4/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
H02G3/266 (EP);
E04F11/163 (EP);
F21S4/20 (EP);
F21V33/006 (EP);
H02G3/0425 (EP);
E04F2011/1048 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/51] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTETE FUSSLEISTE | [2001/51] | English: | LIGHTING STRIP | [2001/51] | French: | PLINTHE LUMINEUSE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2008 | CY | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | IE | 10.09.2008 | IT | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | TR | 10.09.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | LU | 03.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | PT | 10.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3408250 (FINEFROCK DONALD W) [A] 1 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 35 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4855882 (BOSS IAN [GB]) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 56 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 63 * * figures 2-9 *; | [A]US4884178 (ROBERTS JAMES R [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 9 * * figures 1,2,9,10 *; | [A]EP0389382 (BOGA INGENIERIE [FR]) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 12 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 30 * * figures 1,7 *; | [A]EP0669492 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 3 * * figures 1,2 * | Examination | DE8531194U | FR2623223 |