EP1183433 - LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Banham Patent Locks Limited 233/235 Kensington High Street London W8 6SF / GB | [2002/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COWPER, Brian Edward 114 Elm Road, New Malden Surrey KT3 3HP / GB | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Mosey, Stephen George MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Mosey, Stephen George MARKS & CLERK Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01904230.8 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/10] | WO2001GB00722 | Priority number, date | GB20000005753 | 11.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0005753 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0169016 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183433 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183433 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05B9/08, E05B13/00, E05B15/10, E05B63/00 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
E05B9/082 (EP,US);
E05B13/002 (EP,US);
E05B15/0053 (EP,US);
E05B15/10 (EP,US);
E05B63/0017 (EP,US);
E05B15/004 (EP,US);
E05B15/02 (EP,US);
E05B17/2034 (EP,US);
E05B2063/207 (EP,US);
E05B63/18 (EP,US);
E05B7/00 (EP,US);
Y10S70/57 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5867 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7644 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7661 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLOSS | [2002/10] | English: | LOCK | [2002/10] | French: | VERROU | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 25.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.09.2004 | CH | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | TR | 15.09.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | CY | 22.02.2005 | LU | 22.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | BE | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 22.02.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | BE | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | BE | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | BE | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | CH | 15.09.2004 | |
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1512939 (CHARLES LEDIN) [A] 7 * page 2, line 23 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [X]CH671262 (BAUER KABA AG) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 35 - line 48; figure . *; | [A]FR2708025 (VACHETTE SA [FR]) [A] 1* page 6, line 3 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2290579 (YALE SECURITY PROD LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 19; figure . * |