Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.09.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
08.02.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
12.02.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.02.2003 | Renewal fee | |
30.08.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
30.08.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
29.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.07.2002 | Change - extension states | |
17.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.07.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.03.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication |