Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100362574B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2002 | B1 | KR20010076319 | 11.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 | KR20010002711 | 17.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003520550 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 | KR0100070 | 17.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU767627B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2003 | B2 | AU3235901 | 31.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 | KR0100070 | 17.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1249078 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 | KR0100070 | 17.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2397052 | 26.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 | KR0100070 | 17.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0154293 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1411633 | 16.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6885653 | 26.04.2005 | B2 | US2002018457 | 14.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 |