EP1249078 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING CHANNEL USING OVSF CODE FOR UPLINK SYNCHRONOUS TRANSMISSION SCHEME IN A W-CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-shi Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Sung-Ho Neutimaeul 306-302, Jeongja-dong, Pundang-gu Songnam-shi, Kyonggi-do 463-010 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Chang-Soo 72-7, Munjeong-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul 138-200 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jae-Yoel Baekdu APT. 960-1401, Sanpon 2-dong Kunpo-shi, Kyonggi-do 435-042 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Seong-Ill Seolak APT. 859-2206, Sanpon-dong Kunpo-shi, Kyonggi-do 435-040 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Ki-Ho 564, Daeya-dong, Siheung-shi Kyonggi-do 429-010 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Ho-Kyu 56-2, Jamwon-dong, Socho-gu Seoul 137-030 / KR | 07 /
LEE, Hyun-Woo, Byeoksan APT. 806-901, Kweonseon-dong, Kweonseon-gu Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do 441-390 / KR | 08 /
KWAK, Yong-Jun 339, Jukjeon-ri, Suji-eup. Yongin-shi Kyonggi-do 449-840 / KR | 09 /
LEE, Kook-Heui, Cheongsolmaeul Seokwang APT. 103-202, Keumgok-dong, Pundang-gu Songnam-shi, Kyonggi-do 463-480 / KR | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01904584.8 | 17.01.2001 | [2002/42] | WO2001KR00070 | Priority number, date | KR20000002076 | 17.01.2000 Original published format: KR 2000002076 | KR20000002161 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: KR 2000002161 | KR20000002503 | 19.01.2000 Original published format: KR 2000002503 | KR20000035173 | 24.06.2000 Original published format: KR 2000035173 | KR20000037827 | 29.06.2000 Original published format: KR 2000037827 | KR20000038095 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: KR 2000038095 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154293 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1249078 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/69 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
H04J13/20 (EP,US);
H04J13/0044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUTEILUNG EINES OVSF-KODE BENUTZENDEN KANALS FÜR SYNCHRONE ÜBERTRAGUNG IN AUFWÄRTSRICHTUNG IN EINEM W-CDMA-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2002/42] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING CHANNEL USING OVSF CODE FOR UPLINK SYNCHRONOUS TRANSMISSION SCHEME IN A W-CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2002/42] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'ATTRIBUTION DE CANAL UTILISANT UN CODE OVSF POUR UN SCHEMA DE TRANSMISSION SYNCHRONE EN SENS MONTANT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION W-CDMA | [2002/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 17.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 20.09.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5751761 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US]); | [XP] - T. MINN AND K.Y. SIU, "Dynamic assignment of orthogonal variable spreading factor codes in W-CDMA", IEEE JOURNAL ON SAC, (200008), pages 1429 - 1440, XP000998091 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.864008 | [YP] - R.G. CHENG AND P. LIN, "OVSF code channel assignment for IMT-2000", IEEE VTC-2000, (20000515), pages 2188 - 2192, XP000968392 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2000.851660 | [Y] - K. OKAWA AND F. ADACHI, "Orthogonal multi-spreading factor forward link for coherent DS-CDMA mobile radio", IEEE 6TH ICUPC, (19971012), pages 618 - 622, XP000777896 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICUPC.1997.627238 |