EP1175879 - KOURENKOV'S CANNULA USED FOR A METHOD FOR AN OPERATION OF REFRACTORY-CORRELATING EXIMER-LASER INTRASTROMAL KERATECTOMY (REIK) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ooo Meditsinsky Nauchno-Issledovatelsky Oftalmolog Ichesky Tsentr "Novy Vzglyad" ul. Krylatskie kholmy, 30-2 Moscow, 121614 / RU | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURENKOV, Vyacheslav Vladimirovich ul. Kastanaevskaya, 36-3-31 Moscow, 119121 / RU | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01904670.5 | 01.02.2001 | [2002/05] | WO2001RU00038 | Priority number, date | RU20000102334 | 02.02.2000 Original published format: RU 2000102334 | RU20010102703 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: RU 2001102703 | [2002/05] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0156520 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175879 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/008 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
A61F9/008 (EP,US);
A61F9/00802 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00859 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00872 (EP,US);
A61F9/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOURENKOV-KANÜLEFÜR PHOTOREFRAKTIVES INTRASTROMALES KERATIKTOMIEOPERATIONSVERFAHREN MIT EXIMER-LASER | [2002/05] | English: | KOURENKOV'S CANNULA USED FOR A METHOD FOR AN OPERATION OF REFRACTORY-CORRELATING EXIMER-LASER INTRASTROMAL KERATECTOMY (REIK) | [2002/05] | French: | CANULE DE KOURENKOV DESTINEE A UNE METHODE D'OPERATION DE KERATECTOMIE PHOTOREFRACTIVE INTRASTROMALE PAR LASER EXCIMERE | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2001 | Translation filed | 31.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 02.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2125429 (UFIM NI SKIJ I GLAZNY, et al); | [A]RU2014090 (GUSHANSKIJ EVSEJ I [RU], et al); | [A]US5755700 (KRITZINGER MICHIEL S [ZA], et al); | [AP]WO0074615 (ALCON UNIVERSAL LTD [CH], et al); | [A]WO9852502 (DUTCH OPHTHALMIC RES CT INT BV [NL]) |