EP1163753 - ROTATION, SCALE, AND TRANSLATION RESILIENT PUBLIC WATERMARKING FOR IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Signafy, Inc. 4 Independence Way Princeton, New Jerrsey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOOM, Jeffrey, A. 12 Krebs Road Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
COX, Ingemar, J. 21 LeParc Drive Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Matthew, L. 44 Tee-Ar Place Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
WU, Min 228A Harrison Lane Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 05 /
LIN, Ching-Yung 1155 Warburton Avenue, Apt. 7N Yonkers, NY 10701-1027 / US | 06 /
LUI, Yui, Man 606 Stonegate Way Middle Island, NY 11953 / US | [2002/14] |
Former [2002/10] | 01 /
BLOOM, Jeffrey, A. 10 Hampshire Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | ||
02 /
COX, Ingemar, J. 21 LeParc Drive Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | |||
03 /
MILLER, Matthew, L. 44 Tee-Ar Place Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
04 /
WU, Min 228A Harrison Lane Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
05 /
LIN, Ching-Yung 1155 Warburton Avenue, Apt. 7N Yonkers, NY 10701-1027 / US | |||
06 /
LUI, Yui, Man 606 Stonegate Way Middle Island, NY 11953 / US | |||
Former [2001/51] | 01 /
BLOOM, Jeffrey, A. 10 Hampshire Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | ||
02 /
COX, Ingemar, J. 21 LeParc Drive Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | |||
03 /
MILLER, Matthew, L. 44 Tee-Ar Place Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
04 /
WU, Min 228A Harrison Lane Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
05 /
LIN, Ching-Yung 414 West 120th Street, Apt. 107 New York, NY 10027 / US | |||
06 /
LUI, Yui, Man 606 Stonegate Way Middle Island, NY 11953 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/51] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01904926.1 | 18.01.2001 | [2001/51] | WO2001US01759 | Priority number, date | US20000489752 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: US 489752 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154331 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163753 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04K1/00, H04N1/32 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G06T1/0064 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
H04N1/00005 (EP,US);
H04N1/00037 (EP,US);
H04N1/00074 (EP,US);
H04N1/32154 (EP,US);
H04N1/3216 (EP,US);
H04N1/32267 (EP,US);
H04N1/3232 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/51] | H04K1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | GEGEN ROTATION, MASSSTABSVERÄNDERUNG UND TRANSLATION BESTÄNDIGES ÖFFENTLICHES WASSERZEICHEN FÜR BILDINFORMATIONEN | [2001/51] | English: | ROTATION, SCALE, AND TRANSLATION RESILIENT PUBLIC WATERMARKING FOR IMAGES | [2001/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE FILIGRANE PUBLIC POUR IMAGES A RESILIENCE DE ROTATION, DE CHANGEMENT D'ECHELLE ET DE TRANSLATION | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0860984 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * claim 1 *; | [A] - RUANAIDH J O ET AL, "CRYPTOGRAPHIC COPYRIGHT PROTECTION FOR DIGITAL IMAGES BASED ON WATERMARKING TECHNIQUES", THEORETICAL COMPUTER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1999), vol. 226, no. 1/2, ISSN 0304-3975, pages 117 - 142, XP000937907 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3975(99)00069-9 | International search | [A]EP0905967 (DIGITAL COPYRIGHT TECHNOLOGIES [CH]); | [A] - LIN C.-Y., "Public watermarking surviving general scaling and cropping: An application for print-and-scan process", PROC. MULTIMEDIA AND SECURITY WORKSHOP AT ACM MULTIMEDIA '99, (199910), pages 41 - 46, XP002939819 | [A] - PEREIRA S. ET AL., "Template based recovery of fourier-based watermarks using log-polar and log-log maps", PROC. IEEE INT. CONF. ON MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND SYSTEMS, (199906), pages 870 - 874, XP002939820 | [A] - O RUANAIDH J.J.K. ET AL., "Rotation, scale and translation invariant spread spectrum digital image watermarking", SIGNAL PROCESSING, (199805), vol. 66, pages 303 - 317, XP002939617 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-1684(98)00012-7 | [A] - O RUANAIDH J.J.K. ET AL., "Rotation, scale and translation invariant digital image watermarking", PROC. IEEE INT. CONF. ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (199710), pages 536 - 539, XP002939821 |