EP1252562 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONDUCTING ELECTRONIC COMMERCE TRANSACTIONS USING ELECTRONIC TOKENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PayByClick Corporation 2390 East Camelback Road, Suite 410 Phoenix Arizona 85016 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states PayByClick Corporation 2390 East Camelback Road, Suite 410 Phoenix, Arizona 85016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LING, Marvin, T. 7676 East Tuckey Lane Scottsdale, AZ 85250 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/44] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01905010.3 | 23.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001US02254 | Priority number, date | US20000178239P | 26.01.2000 Original published format: US 178239 P | US20000553695 | 21.04.2000 Original published format: US 553695 | US20000665237 | 18.09.2000 Original published format: US 665237 | US20010753784 | 02.01.2001 Original published format: US 753784 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0155815 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1252562 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
G06Q20/06 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/28 (EP,US);
G06Q20/29 (EP,US);
G06Q20/367 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0222 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0226 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0239 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/44] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT, UM ELEKTRONISCHE HANDELSTRANSAKTIONEN DURCH VERWENDUNG ELEKTRONISCHER MARKIERUNGEN DURCHZUFÜHREN | [2002/44] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONDUCTING ELECTRONIC COMMERCE TRANSACTIONS USING ELECTRONIC TOKENS | [2002/44] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REALISATION DE TRANSACTIONS DE COMMERCE ELECTRONIQUE AU MOYEN DE JETONS ELECTRONIQUES | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.06.2009 | 25.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/42] | 05.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.06.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2004 | 31.01.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9927475 (BARKAN MORDHAI [IL]) [X] 1-42 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US5937391 (IKEDA SEKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-42 * abstract *; | [X]WO9944165 (LYSIUM TRANSACTION SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-42 * abstract *; | [A] - WAYNER P, "DIGITAL CASH", DIGITAL CASH: COMMERCE ON THE NET, (19970401), pages 241 - 245, XP002921211 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * | [A] - O'MAHONY D ET AL, Electronic Payment Systems, ELECTRONIC PAYMENT SYSTEMS, ARTECH HOUSE COMPUTER SCIENCE LIBRARY, BOSTON, MA : ARTECH HOUSE, US, (1997), ISBN 0-89006-925-5, XP002122620 [A] 1-42 * page 146 - page 147 * | [A] - O'MAHONY D. ET AL, Electronic Payment Systems, ARTECH HOUSE INC., (1997), XP002907281 [A] 1-42 * page 191 - page 212 * | International search | [X]US5815657 (WILLIAMS HUMPHREY [US], et al); | [Y]US6018720 (FUJIMOTO JUN [JP]); | [Y]US5943423 (MUFTIC SEAD [SE]); | [A]US5930777 (BARBER TIMOTHY P [US]); | [A]US5878138 (YACOBI YACOV [US]); | [A] - O'MAHONY D. ET AL., Electric payment systems, ARTECH HOUSE INC., (1997), XP002907281 [A] * Chapter 7; page 191 - page 212 * | Examination | WO9927475 | US5937391 | WO9944165 | - WAYNER P, "DIGITAL CASH", DIGITAL CASH: COMMERCE ON THE NET, (19970401), pages 241 - 245, XP002921211 | - O'MAHONY D ET AL, Electronic Payment Systems, ELECTRONIC PAYMENT SYSTEMS, ARTECH HOUSE COMPUTER SCIENCE LIBRARY, BOSTON, MA : ARTECH HOUSE, US, (1997), ISBN 0-89006-925-5, XP002122620 | - O'MAHONY D. ET AL, Electronic Payment Systems, ARTECH HOUSE INC., (1997), XP002907281 |