EP1257318 - IMPLANTABLE SYSTEM FOR NEURAL SENSING AND NERVE STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/47] | METHODS AND IMPLANTABLE SYSTEMS FOR NEURAL SENSING AND NERVE STIMULATION | ||
[2006/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurodan A/S Niels Jernesvej 10 9220 Aalborg / DK | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUGLAND, Morten Norre Tranders Vej 10 DK-9000 Aalborg / DK | 02 /
SINKJAER, Thomas Norgardsvej 3A DK-9260 Gistrup / DK | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01905631.6 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001DK00112 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2006/26] |
Former [2002/47] | DK20000000191 | 17.02.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0160445 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1257318 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257318 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/08 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
A61B5/076 (EP,US);
A61N1/3605 (US);
A61B5/24 (EP);
A61F2/72 (EP,US);
A61N1/0556 (EP,US);
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B5/1038 (EP,US);
A61B5/4052 (EP,US);
A61B5/4519 (EP,US);
A61B5/4528 (EP,US);
A61B5/7217 (EP,US);
A61F2002/704 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARES SYSTEM ZUR NEURALMESSUNG UND NERVENSTIMULATION | [2006/28] | English: | IMPLANTABLE SYSTEM FOR NEURAL SENSING AND NERVE STIMULATION | [2006/28] | French: | SYSTEME IMPLANTABLE DE DETECTION NEURONALE ET DE STIMULATION NERVEUSE | [2006/28] |
Former [2002/47] | VERFAHREN UND IMPLANTIERBARE SYSTEME ZUR NEURALMESSUNG UND NERVENSTIMULATION | ||
Former [2002/47] | METHODS AND IMPLANTABLE SYSTEMS FOR NEURAL SENSING AND NERVE STIMULATION | ||
Former [2002/47] | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES IMPLANTABLES DE DETECTION NEURONALE ET DE STIMULATION NERVEUSE | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 04.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2006 | BE | 20.12.2006 | CH | 20.12.2006 | CY | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | FI | 20.12.2006 | IT | 20.12.2006 | LI | 20.12.2006 | NL | 20.12.2006 | TR | 20.12.2006 | IE | 16.02.2007 | LU | 16.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | SE | 20.03.2007 | GR | 21.03.2007 | ES | 31.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
CY | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 16.02.2007 | ||
LU | 16.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 16.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 16.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
SE | 20.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4750499 (HOFFER JOAQUIN A [CA]) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 47 *; | [A]WO9737720 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 2,3,5,9,12,17 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5814092 (KING GARY WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 13 - line 32; claim 1 * [A] 2-19; | [A]US5814093 (STEIN RICHARD B [CA]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]WO0015293 (AXON ENGINEERING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 15 *; | [XA] - M HAUGLAND ET AL, "Interfacing the body's own sensing receptors into neural prosthesis devices", TECHNOLOGY AND HEALTH CARE 7, (1999), pages 393 - 399, XP002901759 [X] 1,2 * page 394 - page 395 * [A] 3-19 | [A] - Z MATJACIC ET AL, "Wireless control of functional electrical stimulation systems", ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, (1997), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 197 - 200, XP002901760 [A] 2-5,9,12,15,18 * page 199, column 1, line 37 - line 41 * | [A] - M K HAUGLAND, "Cutaneous whole nerve recordings used for correction of fooddrop in hemiplegic man", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON REHABILITATION ENGINEERING, (199512), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 307 - 317, XP002901761 [A] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/86.481970 |